Lawman v. Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino.

Plaintiff: Kari Lawman
Defendant: Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01999
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Sulzer on behalf of All Defendants (Sulzer, Jacob)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Andrisano on behalf of All Defendants (Andrisano, Anthony)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kari Lawman. Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino. waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Murphy, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Due to the Christmas Holiday, the Court finds it necessary to accelerate the date by which the parties joint case management plans must be filed. Accordingly, the parties shall file their joint case management plans by DECEMBER 19, 2018. (eo)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2018 11:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel are advised to see attached calendar for dates that must be used when selecting a trial term. (eo)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4572650), filed by Kari Lawman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawman v. Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert, Rowland & Grubic, Ino.
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Anthony F. Andrisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Lawman
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?