Bryan v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Theodore Bryan
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv02040
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Theodore Bryan. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Berger, Erik)
October 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc #7 DELETED due to filing in wrong case. (ki)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Erik W. Berger, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/26/18. (ki)
October 24, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for petitioner (PA & FL) and local counsel. (rw)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/24/18. (ki)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Theodore Bryan. (Berger, Erik)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Erik W. Berger on behalf of Theodore Bryan Attorney David Chermol is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4578465.. (Berger, Erik)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4576460), filed by Theodore Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Bryan
Represented By: Erik W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?