Dellinger et al v. Richards et al
Plaintiff: Lori L. Dellinger and Walter Dellinger, Jr.
Defendant: Karli Richards, Orthopaedic Center And Sports Medicine, LLC, The Chambersburg Hospital, Wound Center, United States of America and Summit Health
Case Number: 1:2018cv02119
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter filed by United States of America.(Dalke, Samuel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter filed by Summit Health, The Chambersburg Hospital, Wound Center.(Rhoads, Andrew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Summit Health, The Chambersburg Hospital, Wound Center to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Response to Motion to Dismiss Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction)(Rhoads, Andrew)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Dalke, Samuel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Joinder Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Dalke, Samuel)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-1603, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dellinger et al v. Richards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori L. Dellinger
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Dellinger, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karli Richards
Represented By: Michael M. Badowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopaedic Center And Sports Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Michael M. Badowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chambersburg Hospital, Wound Center
Represented By: Kevin E. Osborne
Represented By: Andrew T Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel S Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Health
Represented By: Kevin E. Osborne
Represented By: Andrew T Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?