BROPHY v. THE HARTLEY DOERING GROUP, INC.

Plaintiff: Brendon Brophy
Defendant: The Hartley Doering Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02169
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 6 Featured Case STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Judge Unassigned1 on 11/9/18. (pjr)
November 9, 2018 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-04806 containing electronic documents. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/8/18. 11/8/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 8, 2018 3 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by BRENDON BROPHY.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 7, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING 10 PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/14/18 AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/7/18. 11/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 6, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRENDON BROPHY. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to THE HARTLEY DOERING GROUP, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/7/2018 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]
November 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against THE HARTLEY DOERING GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187535.), filed by BRENDON BROPHY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROPHY v. THE HARTLEY DOERING GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Brophy
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartley Doering Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?