Zimmerman v. Fresa Bistro, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dustin Zimmerman
Defendant: Fresa Bistro, LLC, Lisa Garcia, Callie Alvanitakis, Juan Garcia and Nino Purpurra
Case Number: 1:2018cv02183
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Zimmerman. Callie Alvanitakis served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019; Fresa Bistro, LLC served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019; Juan Garcia served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019; Lisa Garcia served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019; Nino Purpurra served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Karpf, Ari)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Korsen on behalf of Dustin Zimmerman (Korsen, David)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/13/18. (ki)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Callie Alvanitakis, Fresa Bistro, LLC, Juan Garcia, Lisa Garcia, and Nino Purpurra ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4596968), filed by Dustin Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Fresa Bistro, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresa Bistro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callie Alvanitakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nino Purpurra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Zimmerman
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: David N. Korsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?