Kane et al v. Ollies Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joseph Kane, Keisha Edwards and Candi Amuso
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02261
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the case management conference in the above-captioned action is RESCHEDULED to February 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. The telephone number of the Court for purposes of this call is 717-221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/23/2019. (ve)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on February 13, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/14/2019. (ve)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc..(Steele, Heather)
January 9, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Rebecca Predovan. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/8/2019. (ve)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mark J. Gottesfeld on behalf of Candi Amuso, Keisha Edwards, Joseph Kane Attorney Rebecca Predovan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4639331.. (Gottesfeld, Mark)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Gottesfeld on behalf of Candi Amuso, Keisha Edwards, Joseph Kane (Gottesfeld, Mark)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order approving re #21 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs complaint on or before January 10, 2019. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/4/2019. (ve)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steele, Heather)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Kathleen McLeod Caminiti. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/10/2018. (ve)
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Winebrake on behalf of Candi Amuso, Keisha Edwards, Joseph Kane (Winebrake, Peter)
December 4, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Kathleen Caminiti, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kathleen M. Caminiti on behalf of Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc. Attorney Kathleen McLeod Caminiti is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4615783.. (Caminiti, Kathleen)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT Defendant Ollies Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc. shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. No. 1), within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/4/208. (ve)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/28/18. (ve)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Z. Steele on behalf of Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc. (Steele, Heather)
November 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred electronically in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-03475, containing electronic documents.
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer Case to Middle District of Pennsylvania; that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for equitable relief for lack of standing are moot in light of the transfer and may be refiled in the transferee court as appropriate. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/26/2018. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/26/2018. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs claims for equitable relief for lack of standing pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) (Attachments: #1 Certification Supplemental Certification in support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer)(CAMINITI, KATHLEEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOSEPH KANE re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs claims for equitable relief for lack of standing pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) (HEPWORTH, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs claims for equitable relief for lack of standing pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) by OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Kathleen McLeod Caminiti, Esq., #3 Certification of Michelle Stahl, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMINITI, KATHLEEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. identifying Ollies Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CAMINITI, KATHLEEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc., improperly pled as Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.. Attorney KATHLEEN MCLEOD CAMINITI for OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. added. (CAMINITI, KATHLEEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH KANE, KEISHA EDWARDS, CANDI AMUSO. OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (HEPWORTH, MARC)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by CANDI AMUSO, KEISHA EDWARDS, JOSEPH KANE re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (HEPWORTH, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by CANDI AMUSO, KEISHA EDWARDS, JOSEPH KANE. (HEPWORTH, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by JOSEPH KANE, KEISHA EDWARDS, CANDI AMUSO as to Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.. (HEPWORTH, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OLLIE'S BARGAIN OUTLET HOLDINGS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8543682) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSEPH KANE, KEISHA EDWARDS, CANDI AMUSO.(HEPWORTH, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane et al v. Ollies Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kane
Represented By: Marc S. Hepworth
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Rebecca S Predovan
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Edwards
Represented By: Marc S. Hepworth
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Rebecca S Predovan
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi Amuso
Represented By: Marc S. Hepworth
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Rebecca S Predovan
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Mcleod Caminiti
Represented By: Kathleen M. Caminiti
Represented By: Heather Z. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?