Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc. v. American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania

Plaintiff: Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc.
Defendant: American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 1:2018cv02364
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/29/2019. (ve)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc.. American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Popper, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc.. (Popper, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4623408), filed by Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc.(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc. v. American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Warehouse Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel W. Cortes
Represented By: Christopher C Popper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Ash Recycling Corp. of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?