WSSA, LLC v. Safran

Plaintiff: WSSA, LLC
Defendant: Robert Safran
Case Number: 1:2018cv02392
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 4/30/2019 at a time to be determined.(eo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Non-Concurrence by WSSA, LLC re #10 MOTION to Extend Case Management Conference re #8 Scheduling Order . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Magen, Phillip)
February 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service and a certificate of concurrence/non-concurrence for Doc. 10. (pjr)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Case Management Conference re #8 Scheduling Order by WSSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magen, Phillip)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Werley on behalf of WSSA, LLC. (Werley, Bryan)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized when selecting a trial term. (eo)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Philip A. Magen.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 1/4/19. (dmn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anthony R. Twardowski.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 1/4/19. (dmn)
January 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Twardowski and Magen, and Associate Counsel Werley - bar status verified. (dmn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Phillip A. Magen on behalf of WSSA, LLC Attorney Philip A. Magen is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4637724.. (Magen, Phillip)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anthony R. Twardowski on behalf of WSSA, LLC Attorney Anthony R. Twardowski is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4637655.. (Twardowski, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by WSSA, LLC. (Twardowski, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Anthony Twardowski (lg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert Safran and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Safran ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4627434) filed by WSSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSSA, LLC v. Safran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSSA, LLC
Represented By: Anthony R. Twardowski
Represented By: Bryan P. Werley
Represented By: Phillip A. Magen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Safran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?