Celsky v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency

Plaintiff: Keith A. Celsky, Jr.
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and PHEAA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02416
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Keith A. Celsky, Jr. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Weisberg, Larry)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/2/19. (ki)
December 21, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Conner (jw)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4631316), filed by Keith A. Celsky, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celsky v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Celsky, Jr.
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen Todd Mahan, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHEAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?