Bowen v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Trina J. Bowen
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans
Case Number: 1:2019cv00017
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II of the Amended Complaint filed by Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Gost, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II of the Amended Complaint filed by Trina J. Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Dorrance, Bradford)
February 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 11 deleted due to being filed in wrong case. (aaa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II of the Amended Complaint filed by Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Gost, Kimberly)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Count II of the Amended Complaint by Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gost, Kimberly)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Gost, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Christian A. Angotti. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/16/2019. (ve)
January 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas. (aaa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christian A Agnotti on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company Attorney Christian Angotti is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4646939.. (Agnotti, Christian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/11/2019. (ve)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Trina J. Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Dorrance, Bradford)
January 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Kane. (aaa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CV-6078-CV. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4638690), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly J. Gost
Represented By: Christian A Agnotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Administrative Committee, Plan Administrator of Nationwide-Sponsored Health and Welfare Employee Benefits Plans
Represented By: Kimberly J. Gost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina J. Bowen
Represented By: Bradford Dorrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?