Birster v. Amazon.Com, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Birster
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the joint mtn for exttm #5 . Dft's answer/response to the complaint due by 4/15/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/7/19. (ma)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Param, Tara)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Birster. Amazon.Com, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Gunther, Stephen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER/NOTICE Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/8/19. (ma)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4639808), filed by Michael Birster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birster v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Param
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Birster
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?