Byrd v. Brittain et al

Plaintiff: Haddrick Byrd
Defendant: C.O. Chandler, Major Wynder, -, Unit Manager Dowd, Superintendent Brittain, Captain Reese, C.O. Warford #1, Lt. Comisac, Dpty Superintendent White, C.O. Warford #2 and Dpty Superintendent Meintel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
1 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants with copy of complaint and Waiver Order; Copy of Waiver Order also mailed to PA State Attorney General; Waiver of Service due by 4/3/2019. (ep)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants and Copy of Order to Warden for PLRA payment of filing fee ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 3/1/19. (ep)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Haddrick Byrd. (ep)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Haddrick Byrd.(ep)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED UPDATED THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued on 1/10/19. (rw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (rw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Haddrick Byrd allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (rw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Haddrick Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(rw) Modified on 1/14/2019. Documents include a certified statement regarding institutional account. (lp).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Haddrick Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Brittain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Wynder, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Warford #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Comisac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dpty Superintendent White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Warford #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dpty Superintendent Meintel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haddrick Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?