Bender v. McGinley et al

Petitioner: Clarence A. Bender
Respondent: Thomas McGinley and PA Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00060
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RM
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ELECTION filed by Clarence A. Bender. (rw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Ryan H Lysaght on behalf of Thomas McGinley. (rw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Thomas McGinley, PA Attorney General by Thomas McGinley, PA Attorney General. (Lysaght, Ryan) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/15/2019) (rw).
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE, re: #6 Order to Show Cause. (rw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE, re: #6 Order to Show Cause. (rw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Respondents, on or before March 25, 2019, shall file an initial response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 11, 2019. (kjn)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, on or before February 25, 2019 the petitioner shall complete and file the enclosed election form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 11, 2019. (kjn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERRAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 11, 2019. (kjn)
February 5, 2019 Receipt of payment from CLARENCE BENDER in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 2/4/2019. Receipt number 333064232 processed by gangeli. (jjs, )
January 22, 2019 VERBAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carlson. (jw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp)
January 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original paperwork forwarded by the Scranton Office. (aaa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clarence A. Bender. (Attachments: #1 part two)(aaa) Modified on 2/11/2019 (kjn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. McGinley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas McGinley
Represented By: Ryan H Lysaght
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA Attorney General
Represented By: Ryan H Lysaght
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarence A. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?