Wiegand v. Esper

Plaintiff: Brandon T. Wiegand
Defendant: Mark Esper
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue - Case Management Conference is RESCHEDULED to 4/30/2019 01:30 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/8/19. (dmn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Mark Esper. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Swauger, Melissa) Modified on 3/8/2019 @ cnsl request to correct typo error in doc name (ki).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained in the attached calendar in their JCMP. (eo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandon T. Wiegand on USAWC/Carlisle Barracks and US Attorney (Austin, Sara)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandon T. Wiegand on US Attorney General (Austin, Sara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mark Esper and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Esper ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4650688), filed by Brandon T. Wiegand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B, #4 C, #5 D, #6 E, #7 F, #8 G, #9 H, #10 I, #11 J, #12 K, #13 L, #14 M, #15 N, #16 O, #17 P, #18 Q, #19 R, #20 S, #21 T, #22 U, #23 V)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiegand v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon T. Wiegand
Represented By: Sara A. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Esper
Represented By: Melissa A. Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?