Marsh v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.

Plaintiff: Keith B. Marsh
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00129
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Co..(Dapper, Kathleen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dapper, Kathleen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT by Keith B. Marsh. (Campbell, Zachary)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Keith B. Marsh. Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Campbell, Zachary)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Twilla on behalf of Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. (Twilla, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Willing Watson on behalf of Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. (Watson, James)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2019 11:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained in the attached calendar in their JCMP. (eo)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Specialty Insurance Co. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4654011), filed by Keith B. Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B, #4 C, #5 D, #6 E, #7 F)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Kathleen P Dapper
Represented By: James Willing Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith B. Marsh
Represented By: Clark DeVere
Represented By: Zachary D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?