Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/6/19 (ve)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Bonekemper, Andrew)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order)(Bonekemper, Andrew)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/24/2019. (ve)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bonekemper, Andrew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 Register of Copyrights filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rw)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
January 22, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4654220), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.207.16.210
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Bonekemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?