KHOURI v. NEXUS BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tina Khouri
Defendant: Nexus Business Solutions, LLC and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00168
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00165.
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/28/19. 1/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. (kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/30/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by TINA KHOURI. (GOODLEY, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/30/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING 10 PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE 1/22/2019 AS TO WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS CASE UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. SEC. 1404, 1406 TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA OR ANOTHER DISTRICT WITH SOME CONNECTION TO THIS DISPUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/15/19. 1/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/30/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TINA KHOURI.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/30/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, NEXUS BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190783.), filed by TINA KHOURI.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHOURI v. NEXUS BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus Business Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Khouri
Represented By: JAMES E GOODLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?