JLG Industries, Inc. v. Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: JLG Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., National Truck Body Solutions, Inc. and LGMG North America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; LGMG North America Inc., Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., National Truck Body Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/29/19 (lg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LGMG North America Inc., Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., National Truck Body Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mangan, Kevin)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 Receipt for Collateral filed by JLG Industries, Inc. (aaa)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., LGMG North America Inc., and National Truck Body Solutions, Inc. have until 3/29/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to JLG Industries, Inc.'s Complaint. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/27/2019. (jr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LGMG North America Inc., Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., National Truck Body Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mangan, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Mangan on behalf of LGMG North America Inc., Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd., National Truck Body Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mangan, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE (aaa)
February 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: BOND as Security and Temporary Restraining Order in the amount of $100,000.00 returned to Bridgett Montgomery via certified mail this date. (pjr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/19/2019. (jr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Entry of Consent Preliminary Injunction by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/15/2019. (jr)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 BOND as Security and Temporary Restraining Order in the amount of $100,000.00 posted by JLG Industries, Inc. (aaa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Copy of BOND in the amount of $ $100,000.00 posted by JLG Industries, Inc. Original to be provided tomorrow. See attached. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (aaa)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #8 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO is granted as follows: Defendants and each of their respective officers, directors, employees, shareholders, members, agents, representative, parents, subsidiaries, and affiliates, and all those persons in active concert or participation with any of them who receive actual notice of this Order, are hereby ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from using, in any manner, the orange and cream color scheme in connection with the advertising, promotion; Plaintiff SHALL POST a bond in the amount of $100,000 with the Clerk of Court within 3 business days of the date of this Order; This temporary restraining order SHALL BE CONSIDERED ISSUED at 5:00pm EST on February 8, 2019, and SHALL EXPIRE at 5:00pm EST on February 22, 2019.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/8/19 (lg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by JLG Industries, Inc..(Montgomery, Bridget)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of of Concurrence (Supplemental) to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words by JLG Industries, Inc. . (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is granted; Plaintiff may file a brief in support of its pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction that is up to 8,000 words in length. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/8/19 (lg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd. on 2/7/19, filed by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Coversheet and Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-1, #3 Exhibit 4-2, #4 Exhibit 5-1, #5 Exhibit 5-2, #6 Exhibits 6-8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10-1, #9 Exhibit 10-2, #10 Exhibit 10-3, #11 Exhibits 11-13, #12 Exhibits 14-18, #13 Exhibits 19-21, #14 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, Bridget)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLG Industries, Inc.. LGMG North America Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLG Industries, Inc.. National Truck Body Solutions, Inc. served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montgomery, Bridget)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JLG Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oshkosh Corporation for JLG Industries, Inc... (Montgomery, Bridget)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an actionTRADEMARK. (aaa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
February 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Brann. (jw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4664266), filed by JLG Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4-1, #6 4-2, #7 5-1, #8 5-2, #9 6, #10 7, #11 8, #12 9, #13 10-1, #14 10-2, #15 10-3, #16 11, #17 12, #18 13, #19 14, #20 15, #21 16, #22 17, #23 18, #24 19, #25 20, #26 21)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JLG Industries, Inc. v. Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lingong Group Jinan Heavy Machinery Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin J. Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Truck Body Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGMG North America Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget E. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?