Fouad v. The Milton Hershey School and School Trust et al
Plaintiff: F. Frederic Fouad
Defendant: Ralph Carfagno, Robert Heist, Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., The Milton Hershey School And School Trust, David Saltzman, Jarad W. Handelman, M. Diane Koken, Andrew S. Cline, Velma Redmond, Jan Loeffler Bergen, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, James W. Brown, James M. Meade, James C. Katzman and Peter Gurt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00253
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 130 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #109 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Memorandum & Order,, filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Myers, Timothy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 129 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #109 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Memorandum & Order,, filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bilus, Alexander)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #126 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #127 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. See order for details. (eo)
April 10, 2019 Filing 127 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 126 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Certificate of NonConcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 125 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #104 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, re: Rules 12(f) and 8 with Certificate of Non-Concurrence/Concurrence filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 124 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #103 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, and Exhibits A-D of Complaint filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 123 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #102 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 122 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #101 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 121 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #103 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, and Exhibits A-D of Complaint filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Bilus, Alexander)
April 5, 2019 Filing 120 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #102 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bilus, Alexander)
April 5, 2019 Filing 119 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #101 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bilus, Alexander)
April 4, 2019 Filing 118 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service filed by Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Myers, Timothy)
April 4, 2019 Filing 117 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #104 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, re: Rules 12(f) and 8 with Certificate of Non-Concurrence/Concurrence filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Myers, Timothy)
April 4, 2019 Filing 116 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Certificate of NonConcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Myers, Timothy)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman.(Bilus, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
March 29, 2019 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helbig, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration in Support re #109 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Memorandum & Order,, filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Fouad, F.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 110 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #109 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Memorandum & Order,, filed by F. Frederic Fouad.(Fouad, F.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 109 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Memorandum & Order,, by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fouad, F.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 108 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust.(Bilus, Alexander)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #96 - NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 96) is hereby GRANTED as follows: a. This matter is STAYED until March 27, 2019. If counsel for Plaintiff enters an appearance prior to that date, the Court shall lift the stay.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/11/19. (dmn)
March 6, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Certificate of Nonconcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service by Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Certificate of NonConcurrence and Concurrence; Certificate of Service by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, re: Rules 12(f) and 8 with Certificate of Non-Concurrence/Concurrence by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Kyle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Strike #45 Complaint,, and Exhibits A-D of Complaint by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman.(Bilus, Alexander)
March 6, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust.(Bilus, Alexander)
March 6, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman.(Bilus, Alexander)
March 6, 2019 Filing 100 REPLY BRIEF re #96 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Two-Week Extension Sought filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Fouad, F.)
March 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: At the request of counsel Doc. 100 is deleted and will be refiled. (pjr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 99 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #96 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Two-Week Extension Sought filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust.(Bilus, Alexander)
March 5, 2019 Filing 98 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #96 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Two-Week Extension Sought filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Myers, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE of by F. Frederic Fouad re #96 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Two-Week Extension Sought . (Fouad, F.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 96 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Two-Week Extension Sought by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) February 22, 2019 Court Order, #3 Exhibit(s) Email Correspondence)(Fouad, F.)
March 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of concurrence/non-concurrence for Doc. 96. (pjr)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized when a trial term is selected. (eo)
March 4, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Frederic Fouad on behalf of F. Frederic Fouad (Fouad, F.)
March 4, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for F. Frederic Fouad can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 93 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Colleen Fox (eo)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Extend Time (eo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 91 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Colleen Fox on behalf of Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust Attorney Colleen Fox, Esq. is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4680335.. (Fox, Colleen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 90 by F. Frederic Fouad. Certificate of Service, Proposed Order, Cert. of Concurrence relating to Motion (Doc. #89). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time, #2 Certificate of Concurrence Certificate of Concurrence/Non-Concurrence)(Schreiber, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Colleen Fox can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
February 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Colleen Fox, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service, a certificate of concurrence/non-concurrence and a proposed order for Doc. 89. Please file these documents using the event: Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events - Document Filed. Doc. 90 deleted - duplicate of Doc. 89. (pjr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 89 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend deadlines to March 6, 2019 by F. Frederic Fouad.(Schreiber, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 88 ANSWER to #45 Complaint,, by Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, The Milton Hershey School And School Trust.(Bilus, Alexander)
February 17, 2019 Filing 87 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05674. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. jw
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying #84 Letter Motion to Stay. The request for a stay is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/13/19) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 85 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Timothy T. Myers dated February 13, 2019 re: #84 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #82 Memorandum & Opinion,, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber dated February 13, 2019. . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 84 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #82 Memorandum & Opinion,, addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber dated February 13, 2019. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad.(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 13, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Middle District of Pennsylvania (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to #45 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jarad W. Handelman.(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION & ORDER: The 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) factors favor transfer. The Motion to Remand is DENIED and the Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for an order revoking the pro hac vice admissions of Jarad W. Handelman, Timothy T. Meyers, and Christine M. Wechsler is moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Dkts. 50 and 59, and to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/6/2019) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/6/2019. REMARK: Jeffrey Schreiber appeared for the plaintiff. Jared Handelman, Perry Amsellem, Christine Wechsler, and Alexander Bilus appeared for the defendants. An Opinion & Order will follow this entry. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Notice of Pre-Motion Conference: A Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, February 6, 2019 @ 11:00 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 81 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Timothy T Myers dated January 18, 2019 re: #79 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber, Esq. dated January 15, 2019. . Document filed by Andrew S. Cline, Jarad W. Handelman. (Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Colleen Fox, Esq. dated 01-18-2019 re: Response to Plaintiff's request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust.(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 79 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber, Esq. dated January 15, 2019. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Jarad W. Handelman in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 77 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 75 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber dated October 29, 2018 enclosing Plaintiff's Amended Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Transfer. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 74 DECLARATION of F. FREDERIC FOUAD in Opposition re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 72 DECLARATION of JEFFREY SCHREIBER in Support re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 71 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Support to Motion to Transfer served on All Attorneys on the Record on 10/12/2018. Service was accepted by ECF. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Andrew H. Cline, Esq. in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Alexander R. Bilus, Esq. with Exhibit A. in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand served on All Attorneys of the Record on 10/12/2018. Service was accepted by ECF. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 65 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. Related Document Number: #60 . (Myers, Timothy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Timothy T. Myers in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 63 DECLARATION of David Saltzman in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Alexander R. Bilus, Esq. with Exhibits A & B. in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, James C. Katzman, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman.(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Timothy T. Myers in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew S. Gordon on behalf of James C. Katzman. (Gordon, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James A. Keller on behalf of James C. Katzman. (Keller, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of of Consent of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by James C. Katzman. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander R. Bilus on behalf of James C. Katzman. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Schreiber in Support re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad.(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 9/13/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)[Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 9/13/2018 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #46 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Perry M. Amsellem dated September 24, 2018 Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. ENDORSEMENT: The highlighted portion is what the Court ordered. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/26/2018) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Perry M. Amsellem dated September 24, 2018 Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman.(Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 45 COMPLAINT against Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Peter Gurt, Jarad W. Handelman, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust, James C. Katzman. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/14/2018. REMARK: Jeffrey Schreiber appeared for the plaintiff. James Keller appeared for The Milton Hershey School and School trust. Perry Amsellen, Christine Wechsler, and Timothy Myers appeared for the remaining defendants. The Court set the following schedule: Plaintiff may file his complaint. Motion to Remand due by: September 28, 2018. Response due by October 12, 2018. Reply due by October 19, 2018. Motion to Transfer due by: October 12, 2018. Response due by October 26, 2018. Reply due by November 2, 2018. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Sam Mauro) (dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Christine M. Wechsler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Christine M. Wechsler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15558570. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Wechsler, Christine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James A. Keller on behalf of Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Keller, James) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Jarad W. Handelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Jarad W. Handelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Timothy T. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for James A. Keller, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15464729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James A. Keller, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Jarad W. Handelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15431469. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Declaration)(Handelman, Jarad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander R. Bilus on behalf of Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Bilus, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew S. Gordon on behalf of Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Gordon, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Timothy T. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Service. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15429369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy Myers with Certs of Good Standing)(Myers, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Alexander R. Bilus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Andrew Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Calendar Entry *DATE CHANGE*: The Pre-Motion Conference scheduled to go forward on Tuesday, August 7, 2018 is rescheduled to: Thursday, September 13, 2018 @ 3:45 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J, Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, NY, NY. Reason for adjournment (on consent): the 8/7/18 not a convenient date for the parties. A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY (reset via e-mail communication by: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy). (dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Alexander R. Bilus, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15373132. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexander R. Bilus, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Notice of Pre-Motion Conference: A Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, August 7, 2018 @ 11:00 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 30 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Colleen Fox, Esq. dated 07/25/2018 re: #21 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber, Esq. dated July 20, 2018. . Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 29 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Perry M. Amsellem dated July 25, 2018 re: #21 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber, Esq. dated July 20, 2018. . Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 28 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber dated July 25, 2018 re: #22 LETTER MOTION for Conference for the Removing Defendants to Move to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Pennsylvania addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Perry M. Amsellem dated July 20, 2018. . Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on DAVID SALTZMAN on 07/19/2018. Service was accepted by DAVID SALTZMAN. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Colleen Fox, Esq. dated 07/25/2018 re: Response to Letter dated 07/20/2018. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust.(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Andrew Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15361361. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, David Saltzman, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Gordon, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by David Saltzman. (Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen Fox on behalf of David Saltzman. (Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Conference for the Removing Defendants to Move to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Pennsylvania addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Perry M. Amsellem dated July 20, 2018. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handelman.(Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeffrey Schreiber, Esq. dated July 20, 2018. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad.(Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on JAMES W. BROWN on 06/26/2018. Service was accepted by Lynn Brown, wife. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore on 07/10/2018. Service was accepted by Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of of Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Robert C. Heist on 06/27/2018. Service was accepted by David Pestell, Esq., person authorized to accept service. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on The Milton Hershey School and School Trust on 06/26/2018. Service was accepted by Kari Ann Umholtz, Legal Assistant. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Peter Gurt on 06/26/2018. Service was accepted by Kari Ann Umholtz, Legal Assistant. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Ralph Carfagno on 06/26/2018. Service was accepted by Kari Ann Umholtz, Legal Assistant. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Andrew S. Cline on 06/26/2018. Service was accepted by Kari Ann Umholtz, Legal Assistant. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Velma Redmond on 06/27/2018. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on M. Diane Koken on 06/27/2018. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on James Mead on 06/28/2018. Service was accepted by Elaine Mead, Wife. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Jan Loeffler Bergen on 06/26/2018. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS WITH NOTICE, NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING, and NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on Eilliott Greenleaf, P.C. on 07/03/2018. Service was accepted by Pamela Hyland, Assistant. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Amanda Falker, Assistant to Jarad W. Handelman, Esq.. Document filed by F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Milton Hershey School and School Trust.(Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen Fox on behalf of Jan Loeffler Bergen, James W. Brown, Ralph Carfagno, Andrew S. Cline, Peter Gurt, Robert Heist, M. Diane Koken, James M. Meade, Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore, Velma Redmond, The Milton Hershey School and School Trust. (Fox, Colleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Schreiber on behalf of F. Frederic Fouad. (Schreiber, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C..(Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155743/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15233814).Document filed by Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Jarad W. Handalman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Amsellem, Perry) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fouad v. The Milton Hershey School and School Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Carfagno
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Heist
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Greenleaf, P.C.
Represented By: Perry M. Amsellem
Represented By: Timothy T. Myers
Represented By: Jarad W. Handelman
Represented By: Kyle M. Elliott
Represented By: Thomas B. Helbig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milton Hershey School And School Trust
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Christine M Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Saltzman
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarad W. Handelman
Represented By: Perry M. Amsellem
Represented By: Timothy T. Myers
Represented By: Jarad W. Handelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Diane Koken
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew S. Cline
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velma Redmond
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Loeffler Bergen
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa L. Peeples-Fullmore
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Brown
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Meade
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Katzman
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Gurt
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrew S. Gordon
Represented By: Colleen Fox
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. Frederic Fouad
Represented By: Jeffrey Schreiber
Represented By: F. Frederic Fouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?