Rhoades v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Cassandra Rhoades
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00279
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: John E Jones
1 Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cassandra Rhoades re #4 Affidavit of Service with Certified Mail Return Receipts re Service of Summons and Complaint on all Defendants (Sims, Suzette)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commission of SS, Atty Gen'l of US, Civil Process Clerk/US Atty on 2/21/2019, filed by Cassandra Rhoades. (Sims, Suzette)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 2/19/19. (dmn)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4677202), filed by Cassandra Rhoades. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoades v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Rhoades
Represented By: Suzette V. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?