Gorse v. Encompass Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: James R. Gorse, Jr.
Counter Plaintiff: Encompass Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00280
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Petition for Removal,, Counterclaim, with Affirmative Defenses by James R. Gorse, Jr.(Durkin, Martin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/2/2019. (ve)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Petition for Removal (Complaint) With Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against James R. Gorse, Jr by Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Defs Answer to Complaint)(Ehrhart, Nicole)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County. (rw)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order approving re #6 Stipulation. Defendant may file an answer or other response to the complaint on or before March 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/26/19. (ve)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File an Answer to Complaint by Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ehrhart, Nicole)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid Q. Alford on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of America (Alford, Brigid)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Encompass Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Ehrhart on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT B by Encompass Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Encompass Insurance Company of America from Court of Common Pleas of Dauphin County, case number 2018-CV-8580-CV. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4677214) filed by Encompass Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorse v. Encompass Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Gorse, Jr.
Represented By: Martin A. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Encompass Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Ehrhart
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?