Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00306
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC (Fiore, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized when a trial term is selected. (eo)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File (eo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Fiore, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiore, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Malibu Media, LLC. (Fiore, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 AO121 sent to Copyright Office. (aaa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4681370), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?