Kotsonis v. Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC

Plaintiff: Dimitra Kotsonis
Defendant: Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00316
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC.(Doyle, Sarah)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Dimitra Kotsonis. (Lease, Adam)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Lease on behalf of Dimitra Kotsonis (Lease, Adam)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 11:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized when a trial term is selected. (eo)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dimitra Kotsonis. Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC waiver sent on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Karpf, Ari)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4682835), filed by Dimitra Kotsonis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/5/2019) (aaa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/5/2019) (aaa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotsonis v. Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avail Personal In-Home Care Services LLC
Represented By: Sarah L. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitra Kotsonis
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: Adam C. Lease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?