Heflin v. Sandusky Lee, LLC

Plaintiff: Vernon Heflin
Defendant: Sandusky Lee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00334
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Bennett, Mischke and Associate Counsel Bloom - bar status verified. (dmn)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joseph W. Catuzzi on behalf of Sandusky Lee, LLC Attorney Philip E. Mischke is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4742656.. (Catuzzi, Joseph)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joseph W. Catuzzi on behalf of Sandusky Lee, LLC Attorney Richard Bennett is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4742623.. (Catuzzi, Joseph)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sandusky Lee, LLC. Sandusky Lee, LLC waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Catuzzi, Joseph)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Catuzzi on behalf of Sandusky Lee, LLC. (Catuzzi, Joseph)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of Vernon Heflin (CERUTTI, JEREMY)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER/NOTICE Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/1/19. (ma)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sandusky Lee, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandusky Lee, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4686187), filed by Vernon Heflin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heflin v. Sandusky Lee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Heflin
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: JEREMY M. CERUTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandusky Lee, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Catuzzi
Represented By: Jonathan F. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?