Gress et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Michael J. Gress and Brandy L. Gress
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00375
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Papers in Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss by Brandy L. Gress, Michael J. Gress. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silverman, Bradley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Non-opposition under Local Rule 7.6 (McElroy, Jason)
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Ofak, Timothy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ofak, Timothy)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Bradley Silverman (eo)
April 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Bradley Silverman and Associate Counsel Gary Lynch - bar status verified. (dmn)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bradley F Silverman on behalf of Brandy L. Gress, Michael J. Gress Attorney Bradley F. Silverman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4722414.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Silverman, Bradley)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian Serafin (eo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Todd Seth Garber (eo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to D. Greg Blankinship (eo)
April 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Blankinship, Serafin, and Garber, and Associate Counsel Gary Lynch and Timothy Ofak - bar status verified. (dmn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Todd S Garber on behalf of Brandy L. Gress, Michael J. Gress Attorney Todd S. Garber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4720566.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Garber, Todd)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian M Serafin on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation Attorney Brian Serafin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4720557.. (Serafin, Brian)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Douglas Gregory Blankinship on behalf of Brandy L. Gress, Michael J. Gress Attorney D. Greg Blankinship is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4720364.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Blankinship, Douglas)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jason McElroy (eo)
April 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Jason W. McElroy and Associate Counsel Timothy P. Ofak - bar status verified. (dmn)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jason W McElroy on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation Attorney Jason McElroy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4718352.. (McElroy, Jason)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2019 09:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that MUST be utilized on the JCMP when a term is selected. (eo)
March 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Matthew Schultz, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew David Schultz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew D. Schultz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4708833.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Schultz, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William Cash III (eo)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (eo)
March 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner William F. Cash III and Associate Counsel Gary F. Lynch - bar status verified. (dmn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William F Cash, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney William F. Cash III is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4706818.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Cash, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Ofak, Timothy)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ofak, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Gress, Brandy L. Gress. Freedom Mortgage Corporation served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Lynch, Gary)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4691305), filed by Michael J. Gress, Brandy L. Gress. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gress et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Gress
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: William F Cash, III
Represented By: Todd S Garber
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Represented By: Bradley F Silverman
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy L. Gress
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Todd S Garber
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Represented By: William F Cash, III
Represented By: Bradley F Silverman
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Brian M Serafin
Represented By: Jason W McElroy
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Ofak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?