Moley v. Schenker, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Moley
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc., Schenker, Inc. and DB Schenker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00792
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint re Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Aerotek, Inc.. (Steele, Heather)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Z. Steele on behalf of Aerotek, Inc. (Steele, Heather)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DB Schenker, Schenker, Inc.. (Ludwig, Steven)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. Ludwig on behalf of DB Schenker, Schenker, Inc. (Ludwig, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Christopher Moley. Aerotek, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Mahan, Steve)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize dates on the attached court calendar when a trial term is selected in their JCMP(eo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Christopher Moley. DB Schenker waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Schenker, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Mahan, Steve)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aerotek, Inc., DB Schenker, Schenker, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4755027), filed by Christopher Moley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moley v. Schenker, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Z. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker, Inc.
Represented By: Steven K. Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Schenker
Represented By: Steven K. Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Moley
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?