Orner v. Amazon.com.dedc LLC,
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Orner
Defendant: Amazon.com.dedc LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00793
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: report of settlement - All ddls in action STAYED, Clrk of Ct directed to mark matter CLOSED for statistical purposes only & directing parties to, as soon as practicable, submit appropriate filing in acc w/ FRCP 41(a). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/27/19. (ki)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Jeremiah Orner (Mahan, Steve)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jeremiah Orner. Amazon.com.dedc LLC, waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Mahan, Steve)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Lindsay L. Vest, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/14/19. (ki)
May 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Lindsay West, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Page 3 of Petition for Special Admission by Amazon.com.dedc LLC,. #4 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Vest, Lindsay)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Lindsay L Vest on behalf of Amazon.com.dedc LLC, Attorney Lindsay Vest is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4757153.. (Vest, Lindsay)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/9/19. (ki)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com.dedc LLC, and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com.dedc LLC, ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4755083), filed by Jeremiah Orner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orner v. Amazon.com.dedc LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com.dedc LLC,
Represented By: Lindsay L Vest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Orner
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?