Buckley v. Universal Sewing Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Kay Buckley
Defendant: Universal Sewing Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00794
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: A Case Management Conference has been set for 8/26/2019 @ 9:15 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone with the call to be initiated by the pltf unless otherwise arranged. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be arranged by 8/19/19. (ma)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Universal Sewing Supply, Inc.. Universal Sewing Supply, Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Drum, Kayla)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Atty Kenneth Hardin on behalf of Universal SewingSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/29/19. (ma)
May 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Kenneth James Hardin, II and Associate Counsel Kayla Drum - bar status verified. (dmn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kayla H Drum on behalf of Universal Sewing Supply, Inc. Attorney Kenneth Hardin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4769312.. (Drum, Kayla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/LETTER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/21/19. (ma)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 with Complaint and Exhibits mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dmn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Sewing Supply, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4755114), filed by Karen Kay Buckley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Universal Sewing Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kay Buckley
Represented By: Carol Steinour Young
Represented By: Emily N. Hart
Represented By: Lois B. Duquette
Represented By: Emily N. Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Sewing Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth James Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla H Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?