Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc. et al v. Viega LLC
Plaintiff: Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc. and Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC
Defendant: Viega LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00822
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2020; Deadline for Motion to Appt Interim Class Cnsl 6/27/19; Consolidated Complaint due by 8/9/19; Class Certification Motion due by 7/30/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 6/15/2021 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2; Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2021; Motions in Limine due by 4/30/21; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 5/25/2021. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/2/19. (ki)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting joint motion to continue & RESCHEDULING Consolidated Case Management Conference from 5/29/19 TO 6/13/2019 @ 10:30 AM w/ counsel for pltf in 1st-filed action (Enginuity v Viega, 1:19-CV-0159) to provide call-in number to all cnsl & intiate the call to chambers @ (717)221-3945 w/ cnsl for all parties to be on line & prepared to proceed @ time call is placed; Parties shall meet & confer in advance of case mgmt conference & prepare joint case mgmt plan & file joint case mgmt plan to the Enginuity docket by no later than 6/7/19... (see Para 4 for specific req'mts/instructions re: joint case mgmt plan). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/24/19. (ki)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc., Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Nicholas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc., Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC. (Levine, Jonathan)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - AND NOW, this 14th day of May, 2019, the court having scheduled a consolidated case management conference in the first three of the above-captioned putative antitrust class action cases to commence at 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, May, 29, 2019, on the basis that the captioned actions are substantially related in law and fact and may be appropriate candidates for consolidation for discovery or trial, or both, and having further ordered the parties to meet and confer to prepare a joint case management plan to govern the first three of the above-captioned cases for submission to the court at least five business days before the consolidated case management conference, and it appearing that the fourth and fifth of the above-captioned cases, both filed on todays date, are also substantially related in law and fact to the first three cases, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel in the two recently-filed cases shall participate in the meet-and-confer process and in the consolidated case management conference scheduled for May 29, 2019, as more fully set forth in the courts order entered in the first-filed action, Enginuity, LLC v. Viega LLC, No. 1:19-CV-159, Doc. 25 (M.D. Pa. May 2, 2019). Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/14/19. (dmn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jonathan K. Levine, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/15/19. (ki) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/16/2019) (dmn).
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Elizabeth C. Pritzker, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/15/19. (ki) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/16/2019) (dmn).
May 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Local counsel's bar status and admission status verified. (aaa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Revised page 3 of Petition for Admission by Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc., Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC. #4 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, #5 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, . (Levine, Jonathan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Jimenez on behalf of Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc., Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC (Jimenez, Nicholas)
May 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that the local counsel listed on the petitions is not admitted to the middle district. Counsel should file Supplements (Page 3 of Petitions), listing local counsel that is admitted to the middle district. (aaa)
May 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jonathan K Levine on behalf of Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc., Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC Attorney Jonathan Levine is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4759362.. (Levine, Jonathan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Elizabeth C. Pritzker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Elizabeth Pritzker is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4759377.. (Pritzker, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/14/19. (ki)
May 14, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Walter Cohen, Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Pritzker, and Heather Haggarty can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Viega LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Viega LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4757969) filed by Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC, Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc. et al v. Viega LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accurate Backflow and Plumbing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Walter W. Cohen
Represented By: Heather P. Haggarty
Represented By: Heather P Haggarty
Represented By: Nicholas R. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homestead Heating & Plumbing, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan K Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Walter W. Cohen
Represented By: Heather P. Haggarty
Represented By: Heather P Haggarty
Represented By: Nicholas R. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?