Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. v. Image By J&K, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp.
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Image By J&K, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00830
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:19-cv-02359, filed 05/31/2019. (jw)
May 31, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to the Order Transferring Case (Doc. No. 4) filed on 5/31/2019. (ve)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED THAT the above-captioned case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for further proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/31/2019. (ve)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company to #2 Order, to Show Cause. (Vance, Bradley)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties are directed to show cause on or before May 30, 2019 why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/20/2019. (ve)
May 14, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Seth B. Rubine. (dmn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia County, PA, case number May Term, 2019 Case No. 00100. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4759475), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp. v. Image By J&K, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image By J&K, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp.
Represented By: Seth B. Rubine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?