Cruz v. D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc..
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cruz
Defendant: D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc..
Case Number: 1:2019cv00881
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Answer with Affirmative Defenses) by D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc...(Collins, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Zareba on behalf of D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc.. (Zareba, Adrian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Holly L. Cline terminated on behalf of D. F. Stauffer Biscuit Co., Inc. d/b/a Stauffer Biscuit Company. (Cline, Holly)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 11/27/2019; Motions in Limine due by 4/1/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2020 @ 11:00 AM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 6/1/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2; Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 5/13/2020. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/27/19. (ki)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RESCHEDULING Initial Case Management Conference from 6/26/19 TO 6/27/2019 @ 03:00 PM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/20/19. (ki)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sylvia Cruz. (Cummings, Derrek)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference for 6/26/2019 @ 02:15 PM - Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the telephone conference to Chambers. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/3/19. (ki)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc... (Collins, Thomas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc... D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc.. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Collins, Thomas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly L. Cline on behalf of D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc.. (Cline, Holly)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Collins on behalf of D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc.. (Collins, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/28/19. (ki)
May 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Chief Judge Conner. (ao)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc.. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4766753), filed by Sylvia Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cruz
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D F Stauffer Biscuit Co. Inc..
Represented By: Adrian Zareba
Represented By: Thomas G. Collins
Represented By: Holly L. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?