Sturgill v. Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Sturgill
Defendant: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv00925
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nathan Kakazu, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/22/2019. (ve)
July 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Nathan Kakazu and Associate Counsel Jillian Snider - bar status verified. (dmn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian N Snider on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust (Snider, Jillian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jillian N Snider on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust Attorney Nathan Kakazu is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4811812.. (Snider, Jillian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elisabeth Sturgill. Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Summers, Sean)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/4/2019. (ve)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4772824), filed by Elisabeth Sturgill.(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgill v. Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Sturgill
Represented By: Sean E. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jillian N Snider
Represented By: Nathan Kakazu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?