Mumma, II v. Double M. Real Estate, LLC et al

Petitioner: Robert M. Mumma, II
Respondent: Pennsy Supply Inc, Double M. Real Estate, LLC and Larry V Young
Trustee: Markian R. Slobodian and Anne K Fiorenza
Case Number: 1:2019cv01024
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - we shall ADOPT the recommendation of Judge Opel and the DENY the Withdrawal Motion (Doc. 1). without prejudice.3 The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. See order for details. (eo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (BK Court W-B 2, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SupplementAL Motion for the Withdrawal of Reference by Robert M. Mumma, II.. (aaa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS by Markian R. Slobodian. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Slobodian, Markian)
June 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Jones. (pjr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Response and Objection of Double M Real Estate LLC and Double M Development to Motion of Robert Mumma, II, for Withdrawal of the Reference of Bankruptcy Matters from The United States Bankruptcy Court of PA under 28 USC Section 157 and Stay the Sale of 2090 North Untion St., Lower Swatara Township Dauphin County, PA. #1 Withdraw the Reference (BK Court W-B 1, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re: Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 Withdraw the Reference (BK Court W-B 1, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE Bankruptcy Court case number 1-17-bk-01334. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Judge Robert Opel. (BK Court W-B 1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumma, II v. Double M. Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsy Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Double M. Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry V Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Markian R. Slobodian
Represented By: Markian R. Slobodian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Anne K Fiorenza
Represented By: Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert M. Mumma, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?