Kline v. Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Kline
Defendant: Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC and Dr. Richard Arriviello, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01043
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0151
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: (1) Defendant Arriviello's First Motion #8 to Dismiss is DISMISSED as MOOT. (2) Plaintiff is required to respond to Defendant Arriviello's Second Motion #15 to Dismiss on or before August 27, 2019. Failure to file a Brief in Opposition may result in Defendant Arriviello's Motion being deemed unopposed or the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/14/19 (rw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Arriviello, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Healey, Patrick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Elite Medical Laboratories and Performance Laboratories, LLC, by Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC. (Fine, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert D. Kline.(pjr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Richard Arriviello, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Healey, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Upon consideration of the unopposed motion #13 for an extension of time filed by Defendants Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc. and Performance Laboratories, LLC, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said motion is GRANTED, the time within which their responsive pleadings to the Complaint must be filed is extended twenty days, until August 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/29/19. (rw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeCesar, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Arriviello, Jr, Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC, filed by Robert D. Kline.(pjr)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff Robert D. Kline will file a Brief in Opposition to Defendant Arriviello's Motion on or before July 26, 2019. Plaintiff is also advised that failure to file a brief in opposition may result in Defendant Arriviello's Motion being deemed unopposed, or the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims. 2. All briefs shall conform to the requirements of Local Rule 7.8. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/12/19. (rw) '
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Arriviello, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Healey, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Upon consideration of the unopposed motion #6 for an extension of time filed by Defendants Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc. and Performance Laboratories, LLC, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc. and Performance Laboratories, LLCs motion is GRANTED, and the time within which their responsive pleadings to the Complaint must be filed is extended twenty days, until July 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 6/26/19. (rw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Richard Arriviello, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Healey, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/26/2019. (rw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeCesar, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. DeCesar on behalf of Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc., Performance Laboratories, LLC (DeCesar, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Form) (rw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 6/20/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(dmn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED to Robert Kline. (dmn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Richard Arriviello, Jr from Court of Common Pleas of Mifflin County, PA, case number CV-2019-437. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4792614), filed by Richard Arriviello, Jr.(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline v. Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Medical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. DeCesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. DeCesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Arriviello, Jr.
Represented By: Cathleen Kelly Rebar
Represented By: Patrick J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?