Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01076
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #6 Motion to Serve Third Party Subpoena is GRANTED subject to the conditions noted in the order. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/21/2019. (sc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE re #6 MOTION Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena (EX PARTE RELIEF SOUGHT) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Klein, Jonathan)
August 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile their Brief in Support to Document 6 as a seperate document. This event can be located under Responses and Replies. (aaa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena (EX PARTE RELIEF SOUGHT) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #2 Declaration Fieser Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #3 Declaration Lansky Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #4 Declaration Stalzer Declaration In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Appendix of Unpublished Cases)(Klein, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 01:15 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates on the attached calendar in their JCMP when a term is selected.(eo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 sent to Register of Copyrights. (aaa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Klein, Jonathan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4796726), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?