Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc. v. Watts Logistics, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc.
Defendant: SMWatts, LLC, Watts Logistics, LLC and Steven M. Watts
Case Number: 1:2019cv01096
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Case Management Conference reset for 11/26/2019 at a time to be determined(eo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Richards, Deirdre)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 11:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates on the attached calendar in their JCMP when a term is selected.(eo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SMWatts, LLC, Steven M. Watts, Watts Logistics, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4799903), filed by Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B, #4 C, #5 D, #6 E, #7 F, #8 G, #9 H, #10 I, #11 J, #12 K, #13 L, #14 M, #15 N)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc. v. Watts Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMWatts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre M Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?