Harris v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vernell D. Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01108
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M Bocchinfuso on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Vernell D. Harris, Jr. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Dorrance, Bradford)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 12:00 PM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates on the attached calendar in their JCMP when a term is selected.(eo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4801725), filed by Vernell D. Harris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M Bocchinfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernell D. Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Bradford Dorrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?