Lake v. Terrasmart, LLC
Plaintiff: Barry A. Lake, Jr.
Defendant: Terrasmart, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01110
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christopher J. Gilligan, Esq.Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/22/2019. (sc)
August 22, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Christopher Gilligan, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christopher J Gilligan on behalf of Terrasmart, LLC Attorney Christopher Gilligan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4851236.. (Gilligan, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew J. Soven terminated. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 8/21/2019. (sc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew J. Soven by Terrasmart, LLC.(Soven, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Christopher J. Gilligan. (dmn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Gilligan on behalf of Terrasmart, LLC. (Gilligan, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Miller on behalf of Terrasmart, LLC. (Miller, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Soven on behalf of Terrasmart, LLC (Soven, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Barry A. Lake, Jr. Terrasmart, LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Cummings, Derrek)
June 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Jones (jw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Terrasmart, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terrasmart, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4801826), filed by Barry A. Lake, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 attachment)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake v. Terrasmart, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry A. Lake, Jr.
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrasmart, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Miller
Represented By: Andrew J. Soven
Represented By: Christopher J Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?