Thompson v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01136
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix)(Markey, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Thompson, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Harley-Davidson's Motion to Dismiss by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Thompson, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(Geren, Lance)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harley-Davidson Motor Company.(Markey, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers' Motion to Dismiss filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(Geren, Lance)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(Geren, Lance)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Markey, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Plaintiff's re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER - The plaintiff's motions to strike (Docs.2 and 4) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 6, 2019. (kjn)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that these two actions ARE CONSOLIDATED for all furtherproceedings, at Civil Number 1:19-CV-1136, and Civil Number 1:19-CV-1312 isadministratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 6, 2019. (kjn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Plaintiff's re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers' Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers' Motion to Dismiss by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(Thompson, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. . (Geren, Lance)
July 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original Doc. 2 (Notice of Removal) deleted and opened as 1:19-cv-1312; (ep)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Strike filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company.(Markey, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(Geren, Lance)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geren, Lance)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Zerbe on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Zerbe, Anne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Thomas W. Thompson, Jr YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/19/2019 (kjn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Markey on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company. (Markey, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs No. 7, 8, and 21 of Defendant Harley-Davidson Motor Company's Notice of Removal filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.(aaa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Paragraph Nos. 7, 8, and 21 of Defendant Harley-Davidson Motor Company's Notice of Removal filed by Thomas W. Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Thomas W. Thompson, Jr YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/2/2019. (kjn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-SU-1593. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4805300), filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company
Represented By: Thomas S. Markey
Represented By: Anne E. Zerbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Andrew J Kelser
Represented By: Lance Geren
Represented By: Lance M. Geren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?