Union Insurance Company v. Mainline Excavating Inc.
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Defendant: Mainline Excavating Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01143
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mainline Excavating Inc..(McCarroll, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 09:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained on the attached calendar when completing their JCMP.(eo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Mainline Excavating Inc.. (McCarroll, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mainline Excavating Inc..(McCarroll, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. McCarroll on behalf of Mainline Excavating Inc. (McCarroll, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Union Insurance Company. Mainline Excavating Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thaddeus S. Kirk (eo)
July 9, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Thaddeus Kirk, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, Corporate Parent Union Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Berkley Mid Atlantic Group for Union Insurance Company. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thaddeus S Kirk on behalf of Union Insurance Company Attorney Thaddeus Kirk is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4808314.. (Kirk, Thaddeus)
July 8, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION for Thaddeus Kirk can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mainline Excavating Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mainline Excavating Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4806571), filed by Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Insurance Company v. Mainline Excavating Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Thaddeus S Kirk
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainline Excavating Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. McCarroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?