Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C. et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C. and Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.
Defendant: UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company and UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01195
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY BRIEF re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc..(Jacob, Gregory)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Over-Length Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Karl)
November 25, 2019 Filing 48 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Cases)(Montgomery, Bridget)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting pltfs' mtn for lv to file excess pgs #46 . Pltfs may file a bropp to dfts' mtn to dismiss of up to 40 pgs or 9000 words.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/22/19. (ma)
November 21, 2019 Filing 46 Consent MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation of Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, Bridget)
October 25, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Healthcare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated for UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.; Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, Corporate Parent Three Rivers Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AmeriChoice Corporation for UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc.; Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated for United HealthCare Services, Inc... (Myers, Karl)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting dfts' mtn to stay discovery #42 . All discovery is stayed pndng resolution of dfts' mtn to dismiss.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/24/19. (ma)
October 23, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF IN SUPPORT DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #42 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED MOTION TO STAY ALL DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc..(Myers, Karl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED MOTION TO STAY ALL DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Feder, #2 Exhibit(s) A to Feder Declaration (Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants), #3 Exhibit(s) B to Feder Declaration (Plaintiffs' Subpoena to National Care Network, LLC), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Myers, Karl)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting the concurred in mtn for exttm #40 . Pltfs shall file thier bripp to dfts' mtn to dismiss #22 by 11/25/2019. Dfts' Reply Brief due by 12/20/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/23/19. (ma)
October 22, 2019 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, Bridget)
October 15, 2019 Filing 39 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Emily Pincow, Esq. on behalf of all pltfs.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/15/19. (ma)
October 15, 2019 Filing 38 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nicholas Ortiz, Esq. on behalf of all pltfs.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/15/19. (ma)
October 15, 2019 Filing 37 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Alan Lash, Esq. on behalf of all pltfs.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/15/19. (ma)
October 15, 2019 Filing 36 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Justin Fineberg, Esq. on behalf of all pltfs.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/15/19. (ma)
October 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Pincow, Fineberg, Lash, Ortiz and Associate Counsel - Bar Status Verified. (dmn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE: The Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/19 has been cancelled pending resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/15/19. (ma)
October 14, 2019 Filing 34 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bridget E. Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Alan D. Lash is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4898527.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
October 14, 2019 Filing 33 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bridget E. Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Nicholas A. Ortiz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4898526.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
October 14, 2019 Filing 32 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bridget E. Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Justin C. Fineberg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4898524.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
October 14, 2019 Filing 31 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bridget E. Montgomery on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Emily L. Pincow is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4898523.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc..(Myers, Karl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan (prepared by all parties) by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Myers, Karl)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting dfts' mtn for lv to file excess pgs #27 . Dfts may file a brsup of their mtn to dismiss #22 not to exceed 6000 pgs.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/10/19. (ma)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Karl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gregory Jacob, Esq. on behalf of dftsSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/1/19. (ma)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Amanda Genovese, Esq. on behalf of dfts.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/30/19. (ma)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kevin Feder, Esq. on behalf of dftsSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/30/19. (ma)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Natash Fedder, Esq. on behalf of dftsSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/30/19. (ma)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Karl)
September 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Gregory Jacob, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregory F Jacob on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. Attorney Gregory F. Jacob is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4883374.. (Jacob, Gregory)
September 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Kevin Feder, Amanda Genovese, Natasha Fedder and Associate Counsel Karl Myers - bar status verified. (dmn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Natasha S Fedder on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. Attorney Natasha S. Fedder is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4882064.. (Fedder, Natasha)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Amanda L Genovese on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. Attorney Amanda L. Genovese is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4882059.. (Genovese, Amanda)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin D Feder on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. Attorney Kevin D. Feder is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4882056.. (Feder, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the mtn for exttm #16 . Dfts granted an exttm to 9/27/19 to respond to pltf's cmplnt.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/5/19. (ma)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Complaint by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Karl)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: A Case Management Conference has been set for 10/16/2019 @ 9:15 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone with the call to be initiated by the pltfs unless arranged otherwise. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be filed by 10/9/19.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/13/19. (ma)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting dfts' mtn for exttm #13 . Dfts shall answer or otherwise respond to pltfs' complaint #1 by 9/13/19.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/8/19. (ma)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Complaint by United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealth Networks, Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc., UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Myers, Karl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl S. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Karl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealth Networks, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealthCare, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. United HealthCare Services, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.. UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/LETTER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/12/19. (ma)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.. (Montgomery, Bridget)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4812820), filed by Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C., Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C. et al v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare of New England, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Karl S. Myers
Represented By: Amanda L Genovese
Represented By: Natasha S Fedder
Represented By: Gregory F Jacob
Represented By: Kevin D Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania, P.C.
Represented By: Bridget E. Montgomery
Represented By: Nicholas A Ortiz
Represented By: Alan D Lash
Represented By: Emily L Pincow
Represented By: Justin C Fineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Physician Associates of Pennsylvania, P.C.
Represented By: Bridget E. Montgomery
Represented By: Nicholas A Ortiz
Represented By: Alan D Lash
Represented By: Emily L Pincow
Represented By: Justin C Fineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?