Suter et al v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Suter and Michael Suter
Defendant: Sandra MacFaline, Sandra F. MacFaline, Sandra MacJoline, Sandra MacFralihne, Sandy MacFaline, S. MacFaline, Sandra Evans, Sandra F. Evans, Sandra P. MacFaline, Sandi Evans, Speedway LLC, Sandra R. MacFaline, Sandra Sheta, Sandra F. Sheta, Sandy Evans and Sandi MacFaline
Case Number: 1:2019cv01222
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 Proposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandra MacFaline, Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Droogan, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ann K Claraval on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Claraval, Mary Ann)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Proposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jane Suter, Michael Suter.(Lutz, David)
August 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 5 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs) -Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jane Suter, Michael Suter. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(Lutz, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas. (pjr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/23/2019. (ve)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Sandra MacFaline, Speedway LLC. (Droogan, Michael)
July 18, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Kelly Woy and Mary Ann Kennedy Claraval can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sandra MacFaline, Speedway LLC from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CV-3830. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4817929), filed by Sandra MacFaline, Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 attachments, #3 attachments)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suter et al v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra F. MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra MacJoline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra MacFralihne
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Evans
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra F. Evans
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra P. MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi Evans
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra R. MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Sheta
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra F. Sheta
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Evans
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi MacFaline
Represented By: Kelly J. Woy
Represented By: Michael T. Droogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Suter
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Represented By: Mary Ann Kennedy Claraval
Represented By: Mary Ann K. Claraval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Suter
Represented By: Mary Ann K. Claraval
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?