Arrington v. Christ Luthern Church
Plaintiff: Larry Arrington
Defendant: Christ Luthern Church
Case Number: 1:2019cv01298
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Court of Common Pleas of York County PA #6 . Pltf's rqst for atty's fees is denied. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/12/19. (ma)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: The case management conference set for 9/16/19 is hereby cancelled pending resolution of the plaintiff's mtn to remand.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/9/19. (ma)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for continuance of Scheduling Conference by Larry Arrington. (DiUlio, Anthony)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christ Luthern Church.(Powell, W.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Larry Arrington.(DiUlio, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony DiUlio on behalf of Larry Arrington (DiUlio, Anthony)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Christ Luthern Church. (Powell, W.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Christ Luthern Church.(Powell, W.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: A Case Management Conference has been set for 9/16/2019 @ 10:15 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone and is to be initiated by the pltf unless arranged otherwise by cnsl. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be filed by 9/9/19.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/29/19. (ma)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christ Luthern Church from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-SU-1692. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4826076), filed by Christ Luthern Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. Christ Luthern Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Arrington
Represented By: Anthony DiUlio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christ Luthern Church
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?