Jones v. D & H Distributing Company
Plaintiff: Dessirae Jones
Defendant: D & H Distributing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01313
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Dessirae Jones. (Salvina, Benjamin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dessirae Jones. D & H Distributing Company waiver sent on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Salvina, Benjamin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 11:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained on the attached calendar when completing their JCMP.(eo)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Benjamin Salvina (eo)
August 2, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Benjamin Salvina and Associate Counsel bar status verified (pjr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Benjamin D Salvina on behalf of Dessirae Jones Attorney Benjamin Salvina is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4832534.. (Salvina, Benjamin)
July 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Jones. (ga)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to D & H Distributing Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D & H Distributing Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4828619), filed by Dessirae Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. D & H Distributing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessirae Jones
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Salvina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & H Distributing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?