Jackson v. United States Citizens et al
Petitioner: Ronnie Jackson
Respondent: United States Citizens and Federal Officials
Case Number: 1:2019cv01378
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION for Extension of Time to to pay filing fee filed by Ronnie Jackson.(mfa)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING action without prejudice & directing Clerk of Court to CLOSE file. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/11/19. (ki)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Clarification of Petnr's 28 U.S.C. 1350 petition by Ronnie Jackson.(ao)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Exclusion of Any Filing Fee or Other Financial Disclosure Obligation, Etc. by Ronnie Jackson.. (lp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Ronnie Jackson.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. United States Citizens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?