Wolman v. Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Baron Wolman
Defendant: Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01386
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvanias case 5:19-cv-03878, filed 08/26/2019. (mfa)
August 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to the Order Transferring Case #6 filed on August 26, 2019. (ve)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case in this district. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/26/2019. (ve)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Richard Liebowitz . (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff is directed to show cause, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, why the above-captioned action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/13/2019. (ve)
August 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Kane. (pjr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 AO121 sent to the Register of Copyrights. (aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4839957), filed by Baron Wolman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 A, #3 B)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolman v. Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baron Wolman
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Chapel Publishing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?