Zirpoli v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Zirpoli
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01428
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Burnette, Lauren)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on November 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/1/2019. (ve)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Funding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding LLC.. (Burnette, Lauren)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc... (Burnette, Lauren)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC.(Burnette, Lauren)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/13/19 (ve)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnette, Lauren)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Edwin J. Kilpela, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/6/2019. (ve)
August 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Edwin J Kilpela on behalf of Benjamin Zirpoli Attorney Edwin Kilpela is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4852360.. (Kilpela, Edwin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/22/2019. (ve)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kevin Abramowicz, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/20/2019. (ve)
August 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
August 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Kane. (pjr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin Abramowicz on behalf of Benjamin Zirpoli Attorney Kevin Abramowicz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4846997.. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
August 16, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FOR Edwin Kilpela and Kevin Abramowicz can be obtained http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4846481), filed by Benjamin Zirpoli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zirpoli v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Zirpoli
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: John B. Keller
Represented By: Kevin Abramowicz
Represented By: Edwin J Kilpela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?