Pritchett v. Alternative Bearings Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Pritchett
Defendant: Alternative Bearings Corporation and Thomas G. Malloy
Case Number: 1:2019cv01493
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas G. Malloy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Jacko, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Thomas G. Malloy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order 1, #4 Proposed Order 2)(Jacko, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alternative Bearings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3)(Jacko, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alternative Bearings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order 1, #4 Proposed Order 2)(Jacko, John)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) By 10/24/19, Dfts shall withdraw, amend, or stand on the currently filed mtns to dismiss #7 and #8 . 2) If Dfts file amended mtns, or elect to stand on the currently filed mtns, Pltf shall file a responsive brief within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/16/19. (ma)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabrielle Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gabrielle Pritchett, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H)(Coyle, Casey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas G. Malloy re #10 Brief in Support (Jacko, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alternative Bearings Corporation re #9 Brief in Support (Jacko, John)
September 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file certificates of service for Docs. 9 & 10. (pjr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim & to Transfer filed by Thomas G. Malloy.(Jacko, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim & to Transfer filed by Alternative Bearings Corporation.(Jacko, John)
September 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 8 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
September 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 7 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim & to Transfer by Thomas G. Malloy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit(s) 1)(Jacko, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim & to Transfer by Alternative Bearings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Word Count Certificate, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit(s) 1, #7 Exhibit(s) 2)(Jacko, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Jacko, III on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacko, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kristin Hoeksema, Esq. on behalf of Alternative Bearings Corporation and Thomas G. MalloySigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/19/19. (ma)
September 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kristin E Hoeksema on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kristin Hoeksema is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4875336.. (Hoeksema, Kristin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER/NOTICE Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/4/19. (ma)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (mfa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4856133), filed by Gabrielle Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchett v. Alternative Bearings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Bearings Corporation
Represented By: Kristin E Hoeksema
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. Malloy
Represented By: Kristin E Hoeksema
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Pritchett
Represented By: Michael McAuliffe Miller
Represented By: Casey A Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?