TE Connectivity Ltd. et al v. Rustler
Plaintiff: TE Connectivity Corporation and TE Connectivity Ltd.
Defendant: Stefan Rustler
Case Number: 1:2019cv01567
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting pltfs TE Connectivity's motion #57 to release bond - the bond filed w/ this court on 9/20/19 is released. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/8/19. (ki)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting joint motion #56 to w/draw & remove from public view certain docs - Clrk of Ct directed to remove from public view & from ECF system & mark as withdrawn Docs. 30 , 31 & 45 in this action. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/7/19. (ki)
November 7, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weber, Justin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Withdraw 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, 45 Brief in Opposition, 31 Brief in Support by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that on or before November 18, 2019, the parties shall provide a joint report on their progress in reaching a final settlement agreement. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/5/2019. (ktt)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/10/2019 (ktt)
October 9, 2019 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Present Memorandum of Understanding by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that on or before October 9, 2019, the parties shall jointly file a memorandum of understanding regarding a final settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/2/2019. (ktt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re: TRO #27 - It is hereby ORDERED that the TRO #27 issued 9/18/19 is AMENDED at paragraph 2 to reflect that the TRO SHALL DISSOLVE automatically by operation of FRCP 65(b)(2) @ close of business on 10/2/19. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/30/19. (ki)
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 Letter from Fridrikh V. Shrayber to Honorable Christopher C. Conner, Chief Judge Requesting Telephone Conference. (Linn, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER rescheduling TIME ONLY for 10/1/19 preliminary injunction hearing & oral argument TO 02:00 PM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/30/19. (ki)
September 30, 2019 Filing 47 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #46 MOTION to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #27 Order Referring case to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for Referral of matters to U.S. Magistrate Judge,,,, filed by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Linn, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #27 Order Referring case to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for Referral of matters to U.S. Magistrate Judge,,,, by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 WITHDRAWN & DOCUMENT DELETED (per 11/7/19 order #58 of court)- BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Cover Page and Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Weber, Justin) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ki).
September 27, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd..(Weber, Justin)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that as soon as possible, the plaintiff shall provide to the court a copy of the subpoena for records sent to Aptiv as well as a list of all documents that the plaintiff seeks from Aptiv. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that as soon as Aptiv has formulated objections to the production of the requested documents, but no later than 10:00 a.m. on September 27, 2019, Aptiv shall provide to the court a copy of said objections. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/26/2019. (ktt)
September 25, 2019 Filing 41 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Declaration of Stefan Rustler), #2 Ex. B (Declaration of Mariya Trickett), #3 Ex. C (Declaration of Glen De Vos), #4 Ex. D (Declaration of Lyle Otremba), #5 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Linn, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/25/2019. (ktt)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING case to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for assignment of parties' dispute re: negotiation of a settlement agreement #37 to a magistrate judge for resolution; and directing that pltfs' ddl to respond to deft's pendng MTD 30 is ext'd to 9/30/19 @ 10:00 a.m. & deeming parties' dispute as to timing of deft's deposition as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/25/19. (ki)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting deft's motion #34 for leave to file br in opp to pltfs' motion for TRO/PI in excess of 15 pp not to exceed 12,500 words. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/25/19. (ki)
September 24, 2019 Filing 37 Letter from Justin G. Weber To Christopher C. Conner, Chief Judge Concerning Discovery Issues. (Weber, Justin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/24/2019. (ktt)
September 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting motion #32 to expedite to extent pltf shall file br responding to defts' MTD 30 by noon on 9/27/19; parties shall be prepared to argue MTD... during PI hearing of 10/1/19. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/23/19. (ki)
September 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Expedite the Court's Resoultion of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 WITHDRAWN & DOCUMENT DELETED (per 11/7/19 order #58 of court)- BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stefan Rustler)(Linn, Robert) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ki).
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 WITHDRAWN & DOCUMENT DELETED (per 11/7/19 order #58 of court) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Stefan Rustler. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Linn, Robert) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ki).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/20/2019. (ktt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 Bond by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.. . (Weber, Justin)
September 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 28 deleted per counsel's request. (aaa)
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Prel Injunction Hearing set for 10/1/2019 09:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 (ki)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re: motion for TRO #2 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motion #2 for TRO GRANTED to extent it seeks TRO pending further proceedings on its request for prelim inj.; 2. Deft temporarily ENJOINED from commencing employment w/ Aptive in role of President, Connection Systems, until court issues ruling on pltf's motion #2 for prelim injunction.; 3. Pltf shall post bond or appropriate security in amt of $300,000 w/ Clrk of Ct... provisions of para 1 & 2 above shall not become effective until this security is posted.; 4. Preliminary injunction hearing set for 9:00 a.m. on 10/1/19 in Ctrm #2.; 5. Parties shall cooperate in completeing all expedited discovery necessary for the hearing... (see para 5 for specific instructions re: discovery disputes, etc.).; 6. Parties shall participate in a settlement conference w/ a US Magistrate Judge on 9/30/19 - this matter REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for assignment to a magistrate judge to preside as settlement officer. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/18/19. (ki) (ki)
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Fridrikh V. Shrayber, Esq. on behalf of Stefan RustlerSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/19. (ma)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kyle Semroc, Esq. on behalf of Stefan RustlerSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/19. (ma)
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ingrid A. Bohme, Esq. on behalf of Stefan RustlerSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/19. (ma)
September 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kyle J Semroc on behalf of Stefan Rustler Attorney Kyle Semroc is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4873912.. (Semroc, Kyle)
September 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Robert M. Linn . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert M. Linn, #2 Declaration of Stefan Rustler, #3 Certificate of Service)(Linn, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ingrid A Bohme on behalf of Stefan Rustler Attorney Ingrid Bohme is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4873144.. (Bohme, Ingrid)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Fridrikh V. Shrayber on behalf of Stefan Rustler Attorney Fridrikh Shrayber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4873133.. (Shrayber, Fridrikh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Matthew V. DelDuca . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(DelDuca, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic emergency TRO hearing held on 13 September 2019 before Chief Judge Conner. Court Reporter: Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR (telephone number 717-542-5569). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019.
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Matthew V. DelDuca.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/13/19. (dmn)
September 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS, filed by Wesley J. Armstrong, of telephone conference oral argument held before Chief Judge Conner on 13 September 2019. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Chief Judge Conner on 13 September 2019. By: s/ Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR.
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew V. DelDuca on behalf of TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd. Attorney Matthew V. DelDuca is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4871033.. (DelDuca, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Scheduling Order,,, #4 Exhibit, #5 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation, #3 Brief in Support, #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, Confirmation of Service Acknowledgement filed by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Weber, Justin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac P Wakefield on behalf of Stefan Rustler (Wakefield, Isaac)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Thomas Wyland on behalf of Stefan Rustler (Wyland, Scott)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent TE Connectivity Ltd. for TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.. (Weber, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Linn on behalf of Stefan Rustler (Linn, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER re: motion #2 for TRO & PI: It is hereby ORDERED that - 1. A telephonic hearing re: request for TRO set for 9/13/2019 @ 11:00 AM with cnsl for TE Connectivity to initiate the call to chambers w/ all parties on line & prepared to discuss motion #2 generally & requested injunctive relief.; 2. Cnsl for TE Connectivity shall immediately effect service of motion #2 for PI & this order upon deft & when id'd deft's cnsl - cnsl for TE Connectivity shall provide the court w/ proof of service of motion for PI & this order.; 3. Cnsl for TE Connectivity shall exercise best efforts in ascertaining ID of deft's cnsl - if cnsl for TE unable to ID cnsl for deft prior to the telephonic conference scheduled in Para 1, cnsl shall certify to the court that all reasonable efforts have been made to ID deft's cnsl & provide notice of the call. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/11/19. (ki)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plts' motion #5 for leave to file br in excess of 15 pp. not to exceed 7,200 words in supp of motion for TRO & PI. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/11/19. (ki)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Stefan Rustler and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit for its Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd. (Attachments: #1 2, #2 3, #3 4, #4 5, #5 6, #6 Appendix)(aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd.(aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TE Connectivity Corporation, TE Connectivity Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(aaa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stefan Rustler ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4868114), filed by TE Connectivity Ltd., TE Connectivity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TE Connectivity Ltd. et al v. Rustler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TE Connectivity Corporation
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Represented By: Matthew V. DelDuca
Represented By: Adam Ryan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TE Connectivity Ltd.
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Represented By: Matthew V. DelDuca
Represented By: Adam Ryan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Rustler
Represented By: Robert M. Linn
Represented By: Isaac P Wakefield
Represented By: Kyle J Semroc
Represented By: Fridrikh V. Shrayber
Represented By: Scott Thomas Wyland
Represented By: Ingrid A Bohme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?