GRAHAM v. CONNORS
Plaintiff: Frederick Graham
Defendant: Ian Connors
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01571
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.5, and Rule 4 by Frederick Graham.(ga)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Immediate Jutice from the Philadelphia Court toregain jurisdiction of the injunctive relief w/Notice and Exhibits by Frederick Graham.(ga)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 19) is GRANTED; The complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DEEMED FILED; The complaint (Doc. No. 1) is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Plaintiffs various motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. Nos. 6, 7, 12, 14, 21) are DENIED; Plaintiffs motion for leave to file electronically using the Courts electronic filing system (Doc. No. 11) is DENIED. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/9/2019. (ve)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re (Doc. No. 1) Complaint. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/9/2019. (ve)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (ep) Modified on 9/30/2019 (lp).
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Plaintiff's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 09/23/2019. (lp) Modified on 9/23/2019 (lp). Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff.
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Temporary Injunction Relief by Frederick Graham.(ao)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Frederick Graham. (ao)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Graham.(ao)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #17 Brief in Opposition,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, part 2, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Butler, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION Temporary Injunction, #6 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #2 , #14 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #11 MOTION Under Local Rule 5.1.2(4)(b), #12 MOTION Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1(f) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Butler, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to Court by Frederick Graham (ga)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Government is directed to respond to Plaintiffs allegations, set forth within his motions for injunctive relief and supplement, by 12:00 p.m. on Monday, September 23, 2019; and 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the United States Attorneys Office for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/20/2019. (ve)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental MOTION for Injunction by Frederick Graham.(ep)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Supplement by Frederick Graham. to #7 MOTION Temporary Injunction. (ep)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Pursuant to Local Rule 26.1(f) by Frederick Graham.(ga)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Under Local Rule 5.1.2(4)(b) by Frederick Graham.(ga)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 09/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/11/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(dmn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (dmn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Temporary Injunction filed by Frederick Graham.(dmn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Frederick Graham.(dmn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-03919 containing electronic documents.
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/3/19. 9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) Modified on 9/6/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FREDERICK GRAHAM. (lisad, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FILED BY FREDERICK GRAHAM.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Lodged - No FF paid and no Motion for IFP Filed) against IAN CONNORS, filed by FREDERICK GRAHAM.NO FEE PAID, NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 ENVELOPE)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #3 Designation Form , CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM) (amas, ).[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/11/2019.] Modified on 9/11/2019 (dmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?